Global patent index - EP 0777984 B1

EP 0777984 B1 2001-03-28 - Safety belt buckle with a buckle tongue lock

Title (en)

Safety belt buckle with a buckle tongue lock

Title (de)

Verschluss für einen Sicherheitsgurt mit einer mit dem Sicherheitsgurt verbundenen Steckzunge

Title (fr)

Boucle de ceinture de sécurité comprenant une languette liée à la boucle

Publication

EP 0777984 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96119615 A

Priority

DE 19545899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0777984A2] One end of the locking element (1) is pivot mounted on a support defining the guide duct (2) taking the tongue (11). The other end of the locking element has a first stop face (8) across the guide duct against which the tongue rests. A catch (4) rests against a second stop face of the locking element which has a third stop face (10) on the end of the locking element on which the first stop face is situated. The insertion motion of the tongue is transmitted to the third stop face by an operating lever (12) swivel mounted on the catch. The force of the ejector spring (3) is transmitted by a two-part lever (7) onto the catch. The ejector (14) exerts force onto the first lever arm while the second arm rests against the third stop face during the insertion movement of the tongue.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 11/25

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 11/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 11/2523 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0777984 A2 19970611; EP 0777984 A3 19980114; EP 0777984 B1 20010328; AT 200012 T 20010415; DE 19545899 A1 19970612

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051206

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041206

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-12-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041206

2003-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031230

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031201

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031105

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021206

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011105

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010504

2001-05-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606664

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-03

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200012

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000620

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980701

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT