Global Patent Index - EP 0777985 B1

EP 0777985 B1 2000-05-10 - Foldable screen

Title (en)

Foldable screen

Title (de)

Faltbare Abschirmung

Title (fr)

Ecran pliant

Publication

EP 0777985 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96203320 A

Priority

  • NL 1001852 A
  • NL 1004417 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0777985A1] Foldable screen, comprising a cloth and a frame, which frame comprises a stem and ribs, and the cloth being releasably connected to the frame by fastening means, in which the fastening means with which the cloth is connected along the ribs each comprise an element (1) with a cylindrically shaped wall with a groove (2) through the wall, parallel to the axis of the element, the width of the groove being smaller than the diameter of a rib, the cylindrically shaped wall enclosing a rib and the fastening means being unreleasably connected to the cloth on the side of the cloth on which the ribs are situated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45B 15/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0777985 A1 19970611; EP 0777985 B1 20000510; DE 69608215 D1 20000615; DE 69608215 T2 20010125; NL 1004417 C1 19970610

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071126

2009-08-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090601

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090601

2009-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FABER PRO-MOTION B.V.

- Effective date: 20081130

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: FABER PRO-MOTION B.V.

- Effective date: 20080225

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071203

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061126

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061126

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608215 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990729

1997-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971009

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL