Global patent index - EP 0777990 A3

EP 0777990 A3 2000-11-15 - Wall element

Title (en)

Wall element

Title (de)

Wandelement

Title (fr)

Elément mural

Publication

EP 0777990 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96118189 A

Priority

DE 29519431 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH09285368A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To provide a good view of bottles by arranging each holder so that each bottle can steadily, safely and easily be picked out of the holder and so that the information stated on the bottle labels are legible. SOLUTION: This holder provides an area for laying down a multiple number of bottles 7 on the loading surfaces 54, 56 so that the longitudinal axial lines are extended in perpendicular to a wall surface. Moreover, this holder has an accommodation space 60 to accommodate another bottle 5 so that its longitudinal axial line 62 directs nearly parallel to the wall surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 5/08; A47F 7/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09B 9/00 (2006.01); A47B 73/00 (2006.01); A47F 5/00 (2006.01); A47F 5/08 (2006.01); A47F 7/28 (2006.01); G09B 25/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 73/002 (2013.01); A47F 5/083 (2013.01); A47F 7/283 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29519431 U1 19960418; AU 719335 B2 20000504; AU 7416896 A 19970612; EP 0777990 A2 19970611; EP 0777990 A3 20001115; JP H09285368 A 19971104; US 5897003 A 19990427

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-29 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Extension state: LT

- Payment date: 19961206

2005-06-29 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Extension state: LV

- Payment date: 19961206

2005-06-29 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Extension state: RO

- Payment date: 19961206

2005-06-29 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Country Code:

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Extension state: SI

- Payment date: 19961206

2003-01-22 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020305

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001028

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19961206;LV PAYMENT 20661206;RO PAYMENT 20661206;SI PAYMENT 19961206

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 961206;LV PAYMENT 661206;RO PAYMENT 661206;SI PAYMENT 961206