Global Patent Index - EP 0778112 B1

EP 0778112 B1 2002-09-04 - Process for making wall elements

Title (en)

Process for making wall elements

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Mauerelementen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de blocs pour mur

Publication

EP 0778112 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118166 A

Priority

DE 19545697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0778112A1] Walling blocks of concrete or similar material with variable dimensions and/or shape are made in open mould boxes (1) by placing at least one blanking piece (12) within the mould box (1). The blanking piece (12) is made of elastic, compressible material and is in the shape of a rectangular prism with a height (H) in the unloaded state corresponding to the height of the box (1). The remaining space (16) is filled with concrete (15) which is then compressed by a plunger (14) covering the cross-section of the box so that the blanking piece (12) is compressed at the same time. The side walls (3,4,5,6) of the box are then removed, the plunger (14) is raised, the blanking piece (12) is released and the walling block (20) allowed to harden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 7/02; B28B 7/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/02 (2006.01); B28B 7/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/02 (2013.01); B28B 7/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0778112 A1 19970611; EP 0778112 B1 20020904; AT 223285 T 20020915; DE 19545697 A1 19970612

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080109

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051113

2004-10-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041013

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-10-11 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041011

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VEIT DENNERT K.G. BAUSTOFFBETRIEBE

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609623 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

2002-09-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223285 T 20020915

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010509

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970830

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL