Global Patent Index - EP 0778128 B1

EP 0778128 B1 2000-04-26 - Drive for several transfer cylinders of a printing machine

Title (en)

Drive for several transfer cylinders of a printing machine

Title (de)

Antrieb für mehrere Übertragungszylinder einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Entraînement pour plusieurs cylindres de transfert d'une machine à imprimer

Publication

EP 0778128 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96119437 A

Priority

DE 19545114 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0778128A1] The drive is for a digital printing press. Only one (2) of its several transfer cylinder (1, 2) is connected to a motor (6). The transfer cylinders are connected to each other by lashing rings (9, 10), which roll back against each other under initial tension The initial tension is set to provide sufficient synchronisation between the transfer cylinders. The cylinders may each have a lashing ring at each axial end. The initial tension of two cylinders rolling against each other is considerably greater than the pressing force between them multiplied by the grip friction coefficient.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 1/00; B41F 13/008; B41F 13/21

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/008 (2006.01); B41F 13/08 (2006.01); B41F 13/21 (2006.01); B41F 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/008 (2013.01); B41F 13/21 (2013.01); B41P 2227/70 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19545114 A1 19970605; AU 721243 B2 20000629; AU 7412596 A 19970612; EP 0778128 A1 19970611; EP 0778128 B1 20000426; JP H09174803 A 19970708; US 5809883 A 19980922

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605036

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605036

- Effective date: 20120702

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111204

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111204

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101231

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-09-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000829

2000-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: RODI, ANTON

2000-06-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RODI, ANTON

2000-06-21 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Free text: RODI, ANTON

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605036 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-04-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990712

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961204

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL