Global Patent Index - EP 0778148 B1

EP 0778148 B1 2001-12-05 - Keying system for ink supply containers

Title (en)

Keying system for ink supply containers

Title (de)

Kodierungsvorrichtung für Tintenzufuhrbehälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de codage pour réservoirs d'alimentation en encre

Publication

EP 0778148 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96306871 A

Priority

US 56652195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0778148A1] Ink supply containers (20) for reservoirs of ink are provided with features (130, 131) that serve as keys and keyways. A docking station (132) is carried in a printer. The docking station defines bays into which supply containers may be inserted. Each bay is associated with an ink delivery system that is unique to a particular type of ink. Each bay has formed keys (138) and keyways (140) that correspond to keys and keyways of the containers. The keying system prevents a user from inserting into the bay any container other than the container having the correct ink type. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/21 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17513 (2013.01); B41J 2/1752 (2013.01); B41J 2/17523 (2013.01); B41J 2/1755 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0778148 A1 19970611; EP 0778148 B1 20011205; DE 69617610 D1 20020117; DE 69617610 T2 20020508; JP H09174879 A 19970708

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130920

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130920

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69617610

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130920

2014-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120927

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121001

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120329 AND 20120404

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

- Free text: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION#3000 HANOVER STREET#PALO ALTO, CA 94304 (US) -TRANSFER TO- HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION#3000 HANOVER STREET#PALO ALTO, CA 94304 (US)

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617610 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2001-03-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: KEYING SYSTEM FOR INK SUPPLY CONTAINERS

2001-03-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: KEYING APPARATUS FOR INK SUPPLY CONTAINERS

1997-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970912

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970801

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI