Global Patent Index - EP 0778196 B1

EP 0778196 B1 2000-04-05 - Control device of a water-jet propulser for a watercraft

Title (en)

Control device of a water-jet propulser for a watercraft

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines Wasserstrahl-Antriebsgeräts für ein Wasserfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle d'un propulseur à ejection d'eau pour navire

Publication

EP 0778196 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96119265 A

Priority

JP 32007895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0778196A1] A control device for a water-jet propulsor capable of setting an appropriate maneuvering force and suited for complicated maneuver operations involving many ship maneuvering effectors has been demanded. A water-jet propelled watercraft is constituted by disposing at least a pair of main propulsors (5, 6) each having a reverser mechanism to control the forward/reverse thrust and a deflector mechanism to control the deflector angle, and at least a pair of auxiliary propulsors (7, 8) each having a reverser mechanism, both on the port and starboard sides at the stern. Forward/reverse thrusts and deflector angles of the main propulsors (5, 6) are controlled by means of a single joystick (1) and forward/reverse thrusts of the auxiliary propulsors (7, 8) are independently controlled by means of a heading control dial (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 25/46 (2006.01); B63H 11/10 (2006.01); B63H 11/11 (2006.01); B63H 25/02 (2006.01); B63H 25/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 11/10 (2013.01); B63H 25/02 (2013.01); B63H 2011/008 (2013.01); B63H 2025/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0778196 A1 19970611; EP 0778196 B1 20000405; DE 69607573 D1 20000511; DE 69607573 T2 20001019; JP 2788216 B2 19980820; JP H09156596 A 19970617

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081203

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-08-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071217

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607573 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE SE

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990315

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970507

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE SE