Global patent index - EP 0778354 B1

EP 0778354 B1 2001-04-04 - Process for supplying controlled atmosphere gases into a heat treatment furnace and heat treatment plant

Title (en)

Process for supplying controlled atmosphere gases into a heat treatment furnace and heat treatment plant

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Schutzgasversorgung eines Wärmebehandlungsofens und Wärmebehandlungsanlage

Title (fr)

Procédé d'alimentation de gaz protecteur dans un four de traitement thermique et installation de traitement thermique

Publication

EP 0778354 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96119651 A

Priority

DE 19545764 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0778354A1] A protective gas for a heat treatment furnace with several zones is generated from the exit gas from an air separation unit. The gas fraction containing mainly nitrogen is passed into the intake zone and if necessary the exit zone of the furnace without further removal of oxygen. The protective gas used in the heating or treatment zone is obtained from at least a part of the oxygen rich gas fraction from the air separation unit mixed with natural gas or propane by heating and catalytic conversion to mainly carbon monoxide and hydrogen. Also claimed is a heat treatment furnace with a protective gas generating plant that includes an air separation unit (1) and a unit (2) for reacting O2 with a hydrocarbon gas as described above.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 1/76; C21D 1/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/74 (2006.01); C21D 1/76 (2006.01); F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/74 (2013.01); C21D 1/763 (2013.01); F25J 3/04539 (2013.01); F25J 3/04563 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0778354 A1 19970611; EP 0778354 B1 20010404; AT 200307 T 20010415; DE 19545764 A1 19970612; DE 19545764 C2 20000217

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051206

2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20031206

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-12-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031206

2003-12-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031206

2002-12-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021212

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021204

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-19 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606708

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-10

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200307

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE GAS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE TECHNISCHE GASE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991105

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970910

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT