Global Patent Index - EP 0778366 B1

EP 0778366 B1 2001-04-04 - OPERATION SELECTING CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SHIFTER FORK OF TORCHON LACE MACHINE

Title (en)

OPERATION SELECTING CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SHIFTER FORK OF TORCHON LACE MACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SELEKTIVEN STEUERN VON SCHALTGABELN AN EINER TORCHON-KLÖPPELMASCHINE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE SELECTION DE FONCTIONNEMENT POUR FOURCHETTE DE MACHINE A DENTELLE TORCHON

Publication

EP 0778366 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96917697 A

Priority

  • JP 9601647 W
  • JP 14725195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9700343A1] This invention provides operation selecting control method and apparatus for a shifter fork of a torchon lace machine which are capable of satisfactorily following up a high-speed rotation without an erroneous operation, and which have simple constitution. Poles (23a, 23b) as selector rods are supported pivotably on a lift member (20), a part of a driving means so that the poles can act on a part of a fork shaft (14) or a shifter fork (11). Permanent magnets (22a, 22b) are provided on these poles, and solenoids (21a, 21b) in the vicinity thereof so that the solenoids can work magnetically on the poles. In order to move the poles to an operating or non-operating position with respect to the fork shaft or shifter fork, an electric current is applied to the solenoids to generate a homopolar repulsive magnetic field between the solenoids and permanent magnets, whereby the poles constituting selector rods are moved. In order to stop the movement of the poles, the solenoids are deenergized. Thus, the selecting operations are controlled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04C 3/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04C 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04C 3/24 (2013.01); D04C 3/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9700343 A1 19970103; CN 1098944 C 20030115; CN 1155913 A 19970730; DE 69612359 D1 20010510; DE 69612359 T2 20011206; EP 0778366 A1 19970611; EP 0778366 A4 19971119; EP 0778366 B1 20010404; ES 2155607 T3 20010516; JP 3702368 B2 20051005; PL 182249 B1 20011130; PL 318642 A1 19970707

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090615

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090615

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080614

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080717

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070612

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155607 T3

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612359 20010510

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2001-03-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000117

1997-11-19 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19971002

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970225

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT