Global Patent Index - EP 0778382 B1

EP 0778382 B1 2000-05-31 - Security device for double pattern locks

Title (en)

Security device for double pattern locks

Title (de)

Sicherheitsvorrichtung für Doppelbartschlösser

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité pour serrures à panneton double

Publication

EP 0778382 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96119295 A

Priority

IT BO950565 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0778382A1] The security device (17) is placed in front of a double-pattern lock (1) and is actuated by the double-pattern key (12), which has an additional serration (16) that allows to actuate the device into a position for acting on the lock (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/14; E05B 35/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/14 (2006.01); E05B 35/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/142 (2013.01); E05B 35/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GR PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0778382 A1 19970611; EP 0778382 B1 20000531; ES 2147340 T3 20000901; GR 3034248 T3 20001229; IT 1279693 B1 19971216; IT BO950565 A1 19970604; IT BO950565 D0 19951204; PT 778382 E 20001130

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151203

2017-01-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170127

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140702

2014-09-04 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20000401935

- Effective date: 20140702

2013-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20121128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110602

2011-06-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110602

2010-03-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20091105

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-10-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147340 T3

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES GR PT

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990806

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971127

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES GR PT