Global Patent Index - EP 0778384 A3

EP 0778384 A3 2000-07-26 - Electronic key

Title (en)

Electronic key

Title (de)

Elektronischer Schlüssel

Title (fr)

Clé électronique

Publication

EP 0778384 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 96308615 A

Priority

  • JP 31837595 A
  • JP 26754796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0778384A2] A lock mechanism 1 is composed of a locking lever 112, a support pin 204, a spring 203, and a slide button 111. A locking part 2 is composed of an actuator 201 and a stopper 202. A power source part 3 is composed of an electric cell 131 and a cell holder 132. At least two components out of the three components which are the lock mechanism 1, the locking part 2, and the power source part 3 are arranged at positions where they do not overlap each other. By adopting a configuration where a key switch 4 for inputting a code number and the like sectionally overlaps at least one component out of the lock mechanism 1, the locking part 2, and the power source part 3, it is possible to implement a small-sized and thin-type electronic key which can be easily locked and unlocked and can make its electric cell longer in life even in case of keeping the electronic key in either of a locked state or an unlocked state for a long time. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 49/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/52 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); G07C 9/0069 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0017 (2013.01); E05B 2047/002 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0024 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0025 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0034 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0079 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0778384 A2 19970611; EP 0778384 A3 20000726; EP 0778384 B1 20031119; DE 69630765 D1 20031224; DE 69630765 T2 20040415; JP H09217528 A 19970819

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061128

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061128

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2005-11-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051108

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69630765 P 20031224

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020809

2001-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05B 49/00 A, 7E 05B 47/00 B

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB