Global Patent Index - EP 0778386 B1

EP 0778386 B1 2000-09-27 - Actuator assembly to unlock at least a vehicle pivoting cover, in particular of a motor vehicle

Title (en)

Actuator assembly to unlock at least a vehicle pivoting cover, in particular of a motor vehicle

Title (de)

Betätigungseinrichtung zum Entriegeln wenigstens eines schwenkbaren Deckels eines Fahrzeuges, insbesondere Kraftfahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'actionnement pour déverrouiller au moins un couvercle pivotant d'un véhicule, en particulier d'un véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0778386 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116623 A

Priority

DE 19546063 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19546063C1] The bearing housing (19) is of one-piece construction with an elongated inner sill screen (22) and the at least one operating grip (20) at its free ends has a formation directed towards the vehicle exterior. The formation, with the vehicle door closed (3), engages an inner door cladding (37), so that an upward pivoting of the operating grip and a consequent unlocking of the cover is prevented. The operating device has two operating grips, whereby the front operating grip, viewed in the travel direction, is provided for a front cover and the rear operating grip for a rear cover. The operating grips are only pivoted into the upward effective position from their horizontal rest position when the vehicle door is open.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/19; E05B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 53/00 (2006.01); B60J 5/00 (2006.01); E05B 13/00 (2006.01); E05B 83/16 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/16 (2013.01); E05B 13/00 (2013.01); Y10S 292/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19546063 C1 19970417; EP 0778386 A1 19970611; EP 0778386 B1 20000927; JP H09177406 A 19970708; US 5927794 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2005-10-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051017

2005-09-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050906

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-10-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011029

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011017

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605936

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-02

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990313

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971113

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT