Global Patent Index - EP 0778417 B1

EP 0778417 B1 2003-06-11 - Gear pump

Title (en)

Gear pump

Title (de)

Zahnradpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à engrenages

Publication

EP 0778417 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104556 A

Priority

EP 97104556 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0778417A2] The pump has toothed gears (Z1,2) to feed a medium (M) from an intake pipe (ZF) into an outlet pipe (AF). A central axis (ZFA) through the intake pipe encloses an acute angle alpha with the plane (E) formed by the longitudinal axis (A1,2) of the gear or a central axis (AFA) through the outlet pipe encloses an acute angle beta with the plane. One or both angles are between 30 and 60 degrees e.g. 45 degrees, and they may be of the same size. The central axes through the intake and outlet pipes are parallel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/08 (2006.01); F04C 2/18 (2006.01); F04C 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 15/06 (2013.01); F04C 2/086 (2013.01); F04C 2/18 (2013.01); F04C 2250/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0778417 A2 19970611; EP 0778417 A3 19971001; EP 0778417 B1 20030611; DE 59710244 D1 20030717

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59710244

- Effective date: 20131001

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120411

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710244 P 20030717

2003-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SULZER MANAGEMENT AG

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010622

1998-06-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE LI

1998-06-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971204

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH LI

1997-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAAG PUMP SYSTEMS TEXTRON AG

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI