Global Patent Index - EP 0778419 B1

EP 0778419 B1 2001-01-24 - Hydraulic valve control with pressure piloted two ways valve

Title (en)

Hydraulic valve control with pressure piloted two ways valve

Title (de)

Hydraulische Ventilanordnung mit einem druckgesteuerten Wegeventil

Title (fr)

Appareil de commande hydraulique avec une soupape à deux voies pilotée par pression

Publication

EP 0778419 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118169 A

Priority

DE 19545657 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0778419A2] The pressure-controlled directional valve (19) has two working ports (A,B) and a control port (X) which receives the pressure from the first working port (A) via a first constriction (25) and first non-return valve (23). These are bypassed by a first pilot valve (21) in its open position. The control port also receives the pressure from the second working port (B) via a second constriction (24) and second non-return valve (22), which are bypassed likewise by a second pilot valve (20) in its open position. The working ports are connected to pressure transducers (30,31) supplying voltages to the control unit (15) of the motor-driven pump (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0778419 A2 19970611; EP 0778419 A3 19980603; EP 0778419 B1 20010124; DE 19545657 A1 19970612

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606377

- Effective date: 20120601

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051113

2004-06-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2002-11-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021106

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010430

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606377 20010301

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-07-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HYDRAULIC VALVE CONTROL WITH PRESSURE PILOTED TWO WAYS VALVE

2000-03-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HYDRAULIC VALVE CONTROL WITH PRESSURE PILOTED TWO WAYS VALVE

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980918

1998-07-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANNESMANN REXROTH AG

1998-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT