Global Patent Index - EP 0778599 B1

EP 0778599 B1 2001-05-23 - Switch with a temperature sensitive switching mechanism

Title (en)

Switch with a temperature sensitive switching mechanism

Title (de)

Schalter mit einem temperaturabhängigen Schaltwerk

Title (fr)

Interrupteur avec un mécanisme de commutation sensible à la température

Publication

EP 0778599 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118727 A

Priority

DE 19546005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0778599A2] The switch has a housing (11) with a first lower housing part (15) and a second upper housing part (17) as a closure for the lower part (15). The switch has a temperature dependant switch mechanism (12) fitted in the lower housing part (15). For the switch mechanism (12), a first counter contact (23) is provided on the inner base (22) of the upper part (17). A second counter contact (27) is provided on the inner base (26) of the lower part (15). The switch mechanism (12) makes an electrically conductive connection between the two counter contacts in dependence on its temperature. The two counter contacts (23,27) can be contacted from outside through the associated housing part (14,16). At least the lower housing part (15) is made of insulating material. The second contact (27) is formed as a flat part which is held by a form fit in the lower part (15) as an integral carrier part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 37/54; H01H 37/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/5427 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0778599 A2 19970611; EP 0778599 A3 19980527; EP 0778599 B1 20010523; AT 201530 T 20010615; DE 19546005 A1 19970612; DE 19546005 C2 19990708; ES 2158214 T3 20010901; PT 778599 E 20010928; US 5867084 A 19990202

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131123

2015-04-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150407

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606949

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131122

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131122

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 201530 T

- Effective date: 20131122

2014-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-06-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HOFSASS MARCEL

- Effective date: 20131130

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121122

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121122

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HOFSAESS, MARCEL P., DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HOFSAESS, MARCEL, 75305 NEUENBUERG, DE

- Document: DE 59606949

- Effective date: 20121017

2012-12-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606949

- Representative's name: WITTE, WELLER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20121017

2012-12-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606949

- Representative's name: WITTE, WELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20121017

2012-11-30 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606949

- Representative's name: WITTE, WELLER & PARTNER, DE

2012-09-28 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: MARCEL HOFSAESS;JECHABURGER WEG 56;99706 SONDERSHAUSEN (DE)

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-06-06 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070522

2007-05-22 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070522

2005-10-24 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158214 T3

2001-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: LUPPI & CRUGNOLA

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606949 20010628

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201530 T 20010615

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001020

1998-08-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980617

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

1998-05-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOFSAESS, MARCEL

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT