Global Patent Index - EP 0778600 B1

EP 0778600 B1 2001-05-30 - Starter contact with integrated return spring and vehicle starter equipped with such a contactor

Title (en)

Starter contact with integrated return spring and vehicle starter equipped with such a contactor

Title (de)

Starter-Relais mit integrierter Rückstellfeder und Fahrzeuganlasser mit solchem Relais versehen

Title (fr)

Contacteur de démarreur à ressort de rappel intégré et démarreur de véhicule automobile muni d'un tel contacteur

Publication

EP 0778600 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96118027 A

Priority

FR 9514365 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0778600A1] The relay has a moving contact (34) sliding axially on a central section (44) of a control rod (38) having a central through hole (56). The rear transverse face (68) of the hole constitutes an abutment surface for a coil spring (54) exerting pressure on a rear face (84) of the moving contact. In its forward rest position the moving contact has its front face up against an axial stop (66) at the front of the hole through the rod. Two parallel flats (60) on opposite sides of the rod are separated by a distance less than the diameter of the spring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 51/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0778600 A1 19970611; EP 0778600 B1 20010530; DE 69613085 D1 20010705; DE 69613085 T2 20011018; FR 2741995 A1 19970606; FR 2741995 B1 19971226

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081111

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081111

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081111

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071114

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071115

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071108

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-07-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69613085 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001020

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971128

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT