Global Patent Index - EP 0778601 B1

EP 0778601 B1 2001-05-23 - Starter contactor provided with a stop for movable contact made by deformation and the vehicle starter equipped with such a contactor

Title (en)

Starter contactor provided with a stop for movable contact made by deformation and the vehicle starter equipped with such a contactor

Title (de)

Starter-Relais mit einem Anschlag für den beweglichen Kontakt durch Verformung hergestellt, und Fahrzeuganlasser mit solchem Relais versehen

Title (fr)

Contacteur de démarreur muni d'une butée de contact mobile realisée par deformation et démarreur muni d'un tel contacteur

Publication

EP 0778601 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96118028 A

Priority

FR 9514366 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0778601A1] The relay has a moving contact (34) sliding axially on a control rod (38) having an abutment surface which determines the rest position of the rear face (35) of the contact. This provides an abutment surface for a spring (54) coiled around the central section (44) of the rod. The portions (60) of the contact on either side of the central hole are deformable by pressure of pincers (64) applied simultaneously from opposite directions. Another coil spring (55) bears upon a radial shoulder between the central section of the rod and its free end (48).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 51/06; H01H 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/20 (2006.01); H01H 51/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/065 (2013.01); H01H 1/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0778601 A1 19970611; EP 0778601 B1 20010523; DE 69612945 D1 20010628; DE 69612945 T2 20010906; FR 2741996 A1 19970606; FR 2741996 B1 19971226

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69612945

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141113

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091111

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091111

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091111

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081107

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612945 20010628

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001020

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971128

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT