Global Patent Index - EP 0778682 B1

EP 0778682 B1 2000-07-12 - Optical fiber amplifier repeating system

Title (en)

Optical fiber amplifier repeating system

Title (de)

Optisches Faserverstärkerrelaissystem

Title (fr)

Système de répéteur à amplificateur à fibre optique

Publication

EP 0778682 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97101954 A

Priority

  • EP 94116464 A
  • EP 92118891 A
  • JP 29286591 A
  • JP 3184692 A
  • JP 8551892 A
  • JP 16278692 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0541061A2] An optical-fiber light amplifier using rare-earth-doped optical fibers. The light amplifier combines first and second excitation light from first and second sources to form combined excitation light and divides the combined excitation light for inverted distribution to both two optical fibers. The light entered one optical fiber and that entered the other optical fiber are polarized so as to be perpendicular to each other so that fluctuation of output level is prevented without mutual interference. Alternatively the first excitation light and the second excitation light may have different wavelengths; also in this case, fluctuation of level is prevented without any interference.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 10/17; H04B 10/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01S 3/094 (2006.01); H01S 3/13 (2006.01); H04B 10/293 (2013.01); H04B 10/50 (2013.01); H04B 10/66 (2013.01); H01S 3/131 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 10/66 (2013.01); H01S 3/094003 (2013.01); H01S 3/1301 (2013.01); H04B 10/2935 (2013.01); H04B 10/503 (2013.01); H01S 3/06754 (2013.01); H01S 3/09408 (2013.01); H01S 3/094096 (2013.01); H04B 2210/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0541061 A2 19930512; EP 0541061 A3 19940112; EP 0541061 B1 19970702; DE 69220648 D1 19970807; DE 69220648 T2 19971218; DE 69228393 D1 19990318; DE 69228393 T2 19990617; DE 69231259 D1 20000817; DE 69231259 T2 20010104; DE 69231919 D1 20010809; DE 69231919 T2 20020404; EP 0652613 A2 19950510; EP 0652613 A3 19950816; EP 0652613 B1 19990203; EP 0712217 A2 19960515; EP 0712217 A3 19960807; EP 0768766 A2 19970416; EP 0768766 A3 19980121; EP 0768766 B1 20010704; EP 0778682 A2 19970611; EP 0778682 A3 19971022; EP 0778682 B1 20000712; US 5367587 A 19941122

INPADOC legal status


2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111104

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111104

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69231259

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101103

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-05-09 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20070416

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69231259

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-17

2000-07-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 541061

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-07-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 652613

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990923

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971104

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-06-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 652613

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB