Global Patent Index - EP 0778912 B1

EP 0778912 B1 2000-02-09 - DEVICE FOR COATING A MATERIAL WEB ON BOTH SIDES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR COATING A MATERIAL WEB ON BOTH SIDES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEIDSEITIGEN BESCHICHTEN EINER MATERIALBAHN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR L'ENDUCTION DE DEUX FACES D'UNE BANDE DE MATERIAU

Publication

EP 0778912 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95925833 A

Priority

  • DE 4431202 A
  • EP 9502602 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4431202A1] There are prior art devices for applying coating material to both sides of paper or cardboard webs (8) having two adjacent pressure rollers (2, 3) in a frame (1), between which there is a nip (7) through which the paper or cardboard web (8) is taken. On each of the pressure rollers (2, 3) there is an application and metering system (10, 11) which applies a metered film of coating material to their jackets which is then transferred in the nip (7) to the web (8). One of the two pressure rollers (3) is supported so that its circumference can be moved toward the other. According to the invention, in order to adjust the position of the nip (7), one of the two pressure rollers (3) is fitted with a component to move in the nip (7) towards the shared tangent to the two pressure rollers (2, 3). This makes it possible with different web and coating materials to stabilize the withdrawal of the web from the pressure rollers (2, 3) by altering the belt wrap ratios.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/08 (2006.01); B05C 9/04 (2006.01); D21H 23/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 9/04 (2013.01); B05C 1/0826 (2013.01); D21H 23/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4431202 A1 19960307; AT 189724 T 20000215; EP 0778912 A1 19970618; EP 0778912 B1 20000209; ES 2143639 T3 20000516; FI 111399 B 20030715; FI 970860 A0 19970228; FI 970860 A 19970228; US 5803969 A 19980908; WO 9607791 A1 19960314

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090706

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090705

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-03-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080714

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-07-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050705

2004-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030707

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030705

2003-07-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-07-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030705

2002-07-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020722

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020711

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-06-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143639 T3

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507794 20000316

2000-03-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000222

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189724 T 20000215

2000-01-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990519

1997-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970125

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE