Global Patent Index - EP 0778922 B1

EP 0778922 B1 2000-09-20 - DEVICE FOR DETECTING LEAKS IN A FUEL SUPPLY SYSTEM

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DETECTING LEAKS IN A FUEL SUPPLY SYSTEM

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG EINES LECKS IN EINEM KRAFTSTOFFVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION D'UNE FUITE DANS UN SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION EN CARBURANT

Publication

EP 0778922 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96902877 A

Priority

  • DE 9600271 W
  • DE 19520300 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19520300A1] The description relates to a device for detecting a leak in a fuel supply system in an internal combustion engine and especially a diesel engine, in which fuel is supplied to the injection valves at high pressure. The fuel pressure is constantly measured and controled in the usual way by a regulating circuit in that a magnetic valve in the fuel return is suitably operated. If the control device detects the existence of a predeterminable state, e.g. thrust operation, the magnetic valve (24) is closed and the pressure change arising is checked to see whether it changes or whether the pressure rises in the predeterminable manner. If not, a leak is detected and the fuel supply is cut off.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 65/00; F02B 77/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 77/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01); F02M 65/00 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3863 (2013.01); F02B 77/088 (2013.01); F02D 41/22 (2013.01); F02D 41/3827 (2013.01); F02M 55/025 (2013.01); F02M 63/0205 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02M 65/00 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01); F02D 41/123 (2013.01); F02D 2041/224 (2013.01); F02D 2041/225 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0602 (2013.01); F23N 2031/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19520300 A1 19961205; EP 0778922 A1 19970618; EP 0778922 B1 20000920; JP H10503571 A 19980331; US 5715786 A 19980210; WO 9638664 A1 19961205

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150222

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605914

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605914

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-08-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20090601

2004-10-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040222

2004-09-28 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-02-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040223

2004-02-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040222

2003-02-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030225

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-12-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605914 20001026

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990217

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990217

1997-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970605

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE