Global patent index - EP 0778972 B1

EP 0778972 B1 2000-05-17 - DEVICE TO BRING ABOUT A DISPLAY OR THE LIKE

Title (en)

DEVICE TO BRING ABOUT A DISPLAY OR THE LIKE

Title (de)

ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG ODER ÄHNLICHES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PRODUISANT UN AFFICHAGE OU ANALOGUE

Publication

EP 0778972 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95930780 A

Priority

  • SE 9500985 W
  • SE 9402911 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9607171A1] The invention relates to a device for providing a display or the like, which device is composed of a number of picture segments (2, 3) which are activated, e.g. made visible, or non-activated, e.g. made non-visible. The picture segments (2, 3) are, according to the invention, arranged to form a number of equal picture segment units (1) positioned side by side and comprising each a square with an inscribed geometrical figure (2), which by straight or arcuate parts define four identical corner segments (3) of the square, which picture segments are composed of the geometrical figure (2) and the four corner segments (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 9/30; B41J 2/335; B41J 2/345; G09F 9/35

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/445 (2006.01); G02F 1/1343 (2006.01); G09F 9/30 (2006.01); G09F 9/302 (2006.01); G09F 9/35 (2006.01); G09F 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/35 (2013.01); G09F 9/302 (2013.01); G09F 2013/0472 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9607171 A1 19960307; DE 69509908 D1 19990701; DE 69509908 T2 20001207; EP 0778972 A1 19970618; EP 0778972 B1 20000517; ES 2147614 T3 20000916; JP 3651899 B2 20050525; JP H10504915 A 19980512; SE 503357 C2 19960528; SE 9402911 D0 19940901; SE 9402911 L 19960302

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060901

2005-08-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030902

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-09-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-03-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-02-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2002-12-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-11-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-09-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020912

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020826

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TUNNA DISPLAY MODULER AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-02-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2000-12-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69509908

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-28

2000-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2147614

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-03-08 [DB1] DELETION OF B1 DOCUMENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: DB1

1999-10-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

1999-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69509908

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1999-07-01

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-08-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980707

1997-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970325

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT