Global Patent Index - EP 0779022 B1

EP 0779022 B1 2001-12-05 - Haymaking machine

Title (en)

Haymaking machine

Title (de)

Heuwerbungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine de fenaison

Publication

EP 0779022 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96440111 A

Priority

FR 9515314 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0779022A1] The haymaking machine consists of a frame with rotors which turn about vertical axes when the machine is in operation. The frame has a coupling beam (19) between the rotors which has transverse (30) and longitudinal (34) articulated joints. The joints allow the second rotor to move up and down relative to the first and to pivot about the beam's longitudinal geometrical axis within an angle controlled by a limiter (41). The coupling beam is divided in two sections (31,32), with the transverse joint having a horizontal axis (33). The first section of the beam is pivoted to the vertical shaft of the first rotor. The second section has a sleeve (35) with a circular inner aperture connected to the transverse joint and a tube (38) with a collar situated inside the sleeve. The rotation limiter is in the form of two lugs (43) fixed to the sleeve and two adjustable stops (45) on the tube.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01D 78/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01D 78/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01D 78/1085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0779022 A1 19970618; EP 0779022 B1 20011205; AT 209851 T 20011215; DE 69617611 D1 20020117; DE 69617611 T2 20020718; DK 0779022 T3 20020402; FR 2742304 A1 19970620; FR 2742304 B1 19980417

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151212

2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151212

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-09-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 209851 T

- Effective date: 20151212

2016-07-18 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69617611

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617611 20020117

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR IT NL

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209851 T 20011215

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000223

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971204

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR IT NL