Global Patent Index - EP 0779084 B1

EP 0779084 B1 2000-05-03 - Top layer for skis or snowboards

Title (en)

Top layer for skis or snowboards

Title (de)

Oberbelag für Skier/Snowboards

Title (fr)

Couche supérieur d'un ski ou surf des neiges

Publication

EP 0779084 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96119014 A

Priority

DE 29519867 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0779084A2] - Ski or snow-board cover consists of a mono- or co-extruded 2-ply film of copolyamide contg. laurolactam and caprolactam and/or hexamethylene diamine/dicarboxylic acid units, opt. modified with additives.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/00; A63C 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/00 (2006.01); A63C 5/12 (2006.01); A63C 5/14 (2006.01); B32B 27/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B32B 27/34 (2013.01); A63C 5/003 (2013.01); A63C 5/124 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29519867 U1 19970123; AT 192347 T 20000515; EP 0779084 A2 19970618; EP 0779084 A3 19970730; EP 0779084 B1 20000503; JP H09173523 A 19970708

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111127

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 192347

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20111127

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59605122

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120601

2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101112

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090731

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-09 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2007-11-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2007-11-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-11-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051127

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605122

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192347

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980915

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970827

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT