Global Patent Index - EP 0779105 B1

EP 0779105 B1 2001-12-05 - Spray coating device for electrostatic spray coating

Title (en)

Spray coating device for electrostatic spray coating

Title (de)

Sprühbeschichtungsvorrichtung zur elektrostatischen Sprühbeschichtigung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de revêtement par pulvérisation pour le revêtement par pulvérisation electrostatique

Publication

EP 0779105 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115643 A

Priority

DE 19546970 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0779105A1] The apparatus includes a spray gun (2) coupled by an adaptor (4) to the tubular casing (6) through which all wires are routed. The material to be deposited is supplied through a duct (40) to an atomiser (12). The casing is fixed to the rear end of the gun housing (10) which encloses the wire (20) to the ion deflection electrodes (16) and the high-voltage generator (34). It is supported by a positioning device outside the booth with sufficient length (30-200 cm) to extend through an opening in the wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 5/03; B05B 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/03 (2006.01); B05B 15/02 (2006.01); B05B 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/032 (2013.01); B05B 15/555 (2018.02); B05B 15/65 (2018.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0779105 A1 19970618; EP 0779105 B1 20011205; AT 209969 T 20011215; DE 19546970 A1 19970619; DE 19546970 B4 20060817; ES 2169191 T3 20020701; TR 199600963 A2 19970721; US 5759271 A 19980602

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ITW GEMA GMBH

- Effective date: 20120425

2011-12-08 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 59608366

- Effective date: 20111208

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20011205

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20011205

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-12 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20110512

2011-10-12 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20110512

2011-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ITW GEMA GMBH

- Free text: ITW GEMA AG#MOEVENSTRASSE 17#9015 ST. GALLEN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- ITW GEMA GMBH#MOEVENSTRASSE 17#9015 ST. GALLEN (CH)

2011-06-29 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: J. WAGNER AG

- Effective date: 20020905

2011-05-12 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59608366

2011-05-12 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 59608366

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100927

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ITW GEMA A.G.

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: WAGNER INTERNATIONAL AG

2009-04-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: WAGNER INTERNATIONAL AG

- Effective date: 20020905

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081009

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ITW GEMA GMBH

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080902

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ITW GEMA GMBH

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ITW GEMA AG

- Free text: ITW GEMA AG#MOEVENSTRASSE 17#9015 ST. GALLEN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- ITW GEMA AG#MOEVENSTRASSE 17#9015 ST. GALLEN (CH)

2003-01-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: WAGNER INTERNATIONAL AG

2002-10-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WAGNER INTERNATIONAL AG

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169191 T3

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608366 20020117

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011206

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209969 T 20011215

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990127

1999-02-03 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: ITW GEMA AG

1997-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960930

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL