Global Patent Index - EP 0779108 B1

EP 0779108 B1 2000-02-09 - Acoustic imaging arrays

Title (en)

Acoustic imaging arrays

Title (de)

Wandleranordnung für akustische Abbildung

Title (fr)

Réseaux pour l'imagerie acoustique

Publication

EP 0779108 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96308744 A

Priority

GB 9525418 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0779108A2] An acoustic imaging system comprises a plurality of piezoelectric elements (45) in a piezoelectric array (36). The elements transmit and receive acoustic energy. The piezoelectric layer (36) is supported by a sound absorbing layer (34) which, in turn, is supported by a track layer (32) of electrical tracks. The elements (45) are connected to the tracks by means of electrically conducting paths (46) in the absorbing layer (34). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B06B 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/0685 (2013.01); B06B 1/0622 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0779108 A2 19970618; EP 0779108 A3 19971029; EP 0779108 B1 20000209; AU 724201 B2 20000914; AU 7429396 A 19970619; DE 69606609 D1 20000316; DE 69606609 T2 20000608; GB 9525418 D0 19960717

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041203

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-05-13 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-12-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041203

2003-12-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031211

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031210

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031203

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-08-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MARCONI CASWELL LIMITED

2000-11-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606609 20000316

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARCONI ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS LIMITED

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980928

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980429

1997-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB