Global Patent Index - EP 0779113 B1

EP 0779113 B1 2001-04-18 - Roll profile measuring device

Title (en)

Roll profile measuring device

Title (de)

Walzenkontur-Messeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mesure du profil des cylindres d'un laminoir

Publication

EP 0779113 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96250279 A

Priority

DE 19547436 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0779113A1] The apparatus for measuring the contour, in particular, of a roll installed in a stand of a hot-rolling strip mill incorporates at least one distance sensor with its measuring head directed to the roll surface. A beam (7) oriented along the length of roll (1) carriers a number of spaced, identically oriented distance sensors (6). The beam is movable from a parking position into a measuring position parallel to the axis of the roll. In the measuring position the beam is movable relative to the roll in the axial direction of the latter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 38/12; G01B 5/207; G01B 7/287

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 38/12 (2006.01); B21B 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 38/12 (2013.01); B21B 1/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19547436 A1 19970612; EP 0779113 A1 19970618; EP 0779113 B1 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051204

2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-12-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011211

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011208

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011116

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-07-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606799

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-23

2001-05-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990201

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970526

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT