Global Patent Index - EP 0779161 B1

EP 0779161 B1 2000-07-05 - A heat sensitive imaging element and a method for producing lithographic plates therewith

Title (en)

A heat sensitive imaging element and a method for producing lithographic plates therewith

Title (de)

Wärmeempfindliches Aufzeichnungselement und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Flachdruckformen damit

Title (fr)

Elément d'enregistrement de l'image et procédé pour la fabrication de plaques lithographiques utilisant cet élément

Publication

EP 0779161 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95203494 A

Priority

EP 95203494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0779161A1] According to the present invention there is provided a heat sensitive imaging element comprising a support having a hydrophilic surface contiguous to said hydrophilic surface of a support a hydrophobic heat sensitive composition comprising a hydrophobic polymer binder, a compound capable of converting light into heat, and a reactive compound or mixture of reactive compounds present in an amount which surpasses the absorptive capacity of the hydrophobic polymer binder for said compound or mixture of compounds, the said reactive compound or mixture of compounds being reactive under the influence of heat or under the influence of a reagent which is obtained by decomposition of a heat sensitive compound one or more thermo-adhesive layers, at least one of the thermo-adhesive layers being contiguous to the hydrophobic heat sensitive composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/34; B41C 1/10; B41M 5/36; B41M 5/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/004 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 5/36 (2006.01); B41M 5/48 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/11 (2006.01); G03F 7/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/48 (2013.01); B41C 1/1091 (2013.01); B41M 5/368 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0779161 A1 19970618; EP 0779161 B1 20000705; DE 69517815 D1 20000810; DE 69517815 T2 20010201; JP 2901235 B2 19990607; JP H09185162 A 19970715

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-08-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011214

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011214

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001108

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20001103

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001027

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517815 20000810

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981030

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971218

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB