Global Patent Index - EP 0779194 B1

EP 0779194 B1 2000-05-17 - Automotive railway train with at least two coach units

Title (en)

Automotive railway train with at least two coach units

Title (de)

Schienentriebzug mit wenigstens zwei Wagenteilen

Title (fr)

Rame ferroviaire automotrice formée d'au moins deux unités de voiture

Publication

EP 0779194 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96119044 A

Priority

  • DE 19547003 A
  • DE 19645982 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0779194A1] The railway vehicle has three wagon parts (1,2,3) which are hinged or coupled to one another, and which have at least one running wheel set (10). One or more of the wagon parts is equipped with a driving wheel set (6,6'). When at rest, the running and driving wheel sets are loaded statically by components of the weight of the wagon parts, and the running and/or driving wheel set has two wheels which are coupled rigidly together, in order to form a loose wheel set or pair. The vehicle has a device which transfers a component of the static load on at least one running wheel set to at least one driving wheel set, as an additional loading. The device may exert a lifting force on a wagon part (3) which has at least one running wheel set, and may also exert a torque about a horizontal axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61G 5/02; B61C 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61C 15/04 (2006.01); B61G 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61G 5/02 (2013.01); B61C 15/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0779194 A1 19970618; EP 0779194 B1 20000517

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071128

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071128

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080601

2008-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080601

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071128

2007-01-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061117

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061116

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605239 20000621

2000-05-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981026

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970520

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL