Global Patent Index - EP 0779209 B1

EP 0779209 B1 2000-04-19 - Device for the automatic bagging of loaves of bread

Title (en)

Device for the automatic bagging of loaves of bread

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum automatischen Verpacken von Brot in Beuteln

Title (fr)

Installation pour l'ensachement automatique des pains

Publication

EP 0779209 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96420357 A

Priority

FR 9515100 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0779209A1] Loaves of bread are automatically wrapped in a continuous sheath of wrapping (2). The sheath is unrolled from its reel (2'), opened and moved horizontally to the wrapping area. Meanwhile the bread for wrapping (P) is projected (13,14 and 15) into the open free end of the sheath. The sheath is then sealed at the ends of the loaf and cut away from the rest of the reel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/13; B65B 25/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0779209 A1 19970618; EP 0779209 B1 20000419; DE 69607815 D1 20000525; DE 69607815 T2 20001207; ES 2144717 T3 20000616; FR 2742415 A1 19970620; FR 2742415 B1 19980206; GR 3033285 T3 20000929

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151015

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000419

2007-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051214

2006-10-27 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2006-10-27 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051213

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-12-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051213

2004-12-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041206

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-11-26 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20041126

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144717 T3

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607815 20000525

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR

1998-08-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980623

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970825

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR