Global Patent Index - EP 0779391 B1

EP 0779391 B1 2001-04-04 - Method for milling paper fibres

Title (en)

Method for milling paper fibres

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Mahlung von Papierfasern

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le broyage de fibres de papier

Publication

EP 0779391 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115697 A

Priority

DE 19547069 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0779391A1] A process for milling paper fibres (F) in an aqueous suspension entails mechanically stressing the fibres between opposing milling tools (3, 3', 4, 4') moving relative to each other to such an extent that their length is shortened, their surfaces extended or both. They are milled in at least two consecutive stages (1, 2), the primary milling stage (1) being implemented with milling tools (3, 3') from which at least one faces the opposing tool with a porous abrasive surface having a depth of roughness of at least 0.2 mm. In the secondary stage (2) the tools (4, 4') making contact with the fibres are milling bars or blade trimmings which work against one another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21D 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21D 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21D 1/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0779391 A1 19970618; EP 0779391 B1 20010404; AT 200322 T 20010415; CA 2192728 A1 19970617; DE 19547069 A1 19970619; NO 964593 A 19970617; NO 964593 D0 19961030

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-06-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-12 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061012

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061011

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-11 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061011

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606710

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-10

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR SE

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200322

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990913

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971218

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR SE