Global Patent Index - EP 0779393 B1

EP 0779393 B1 2000-03-22 - Calander for treating a paper web and application for this calander

Title (en)

Calander for treating a paper web and application for this calander

Title (de)

Kalander für die Behandlung einer Papierbahn und Anwendung dieses Kalanders

Title (fr)

Calandre pour le traitement d'une bande de papier et application pour cette calandre

Publication

EP 0779393 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118498 A

Priority

DE 19547164 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2191274A1] A calender for treating a web of paper includes a stack of hard rollers and soft rollers. The stack includes a first set of processing nips and a second set of processing nips. Each processing nip is formed by a juncture of one of the hard rollers and one of the soft rollers. One side of the web of paper contacts against the hard rollers in the first set of processing nips and contacts against the soft rollers in the second set of processing nips. At least a last soft roller in the stack, which delimits a last processing nip that the web of paper passes through in the calender, has a lower surface roughness Ra than a surface roughness Ra of at least a first soft roller in the stack. The first soft roller delimits a first processing nip that the web of paper passes through in the calender. The surface roughness Ra of the last soft roller is less than 0.35 .mu.m.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16C 13/00 (2006.01); D21G 1/00 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19547164 C1 19970206; AT 191025 T 20000415; CA 2191274 A1 19970617; CA 2191274 C 20020219; EP 0779393 A1 19970618; EP 0779393 B1 20000322; JP 2710611 B2 19980210; JP H09188988 A 19970722; US 5746124 A 19980505

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-11-03 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-11-03 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20040831

2003-12-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031204

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031125

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031121

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-26 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: EDUARD KUESTERSMASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20001222

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER GMBH;VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2001-08-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2001-08-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER GMBH

2001-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: EDUARD KUESTERS MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG

2001-02-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: EDUARD KUESTERS MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604756 20000427

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-03-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT NL

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191025 T 20000415

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990115

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970422

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT NL