Global Patent Index - EP 0779395 B1

EP 0779395 B1 2001-03-28 - Apparatus for applying surface layers

Title (en)

Apparatus for applying surface layers

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Einbauen von Belagschichten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la pose de couches de revêtement

Publication

EP 0779395 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116712 A

Priority

DE 29519719 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH09184106A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To provide a pavement material to a road finisher in a simple structure by means of a feeder even when two layer-road pavement work is executed. SOLUTION: There are provided two road finishers F1 and F2 while a feeder E, which includes a bulk material hopper 2 for one pavement material A and conveying devices 3 and 4 in the longitudinal direction, is provided in front of the finishers. The front side road finisher F1 is provided with a material hopper 24 for one pavement material A while the rear side road finisher is provided with a material hopper 29 for the other pavement material B. The feeder E is provided with a bulk material hopper 2 and an upper structural body 6 which extends upward to the longitudinal direction conveying device 3 and 4 and longitudinal direction conveying middle storage devices 7, 10 and 14, which extend to the material hopper 29. The front area 7 of the longitudinal direction middle storage device is adjustable about its position of the material hopper 2 between a material receiving position and a non-material receiving position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/48 (2013.01); E01C 2301/02 (2013.01); E01C 2301/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29519719 U1 19960201; AT 200123 T 20010415; CN 1141448 C 20040310; CN 1158374 A 19970903; EP 0779395 A1 19970618; EP 0779395 B1 20010328; JP 2909034 B2 19990623; JP H09184106 A 19970715; US 5846022 A 19981208

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59606665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-04-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JOSEPH VOEGELE AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59606665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-04-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59606665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-04-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59606665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-02-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59606665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20031017

2004-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: JOSEPH *VOGELE A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031017

2003-10-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031017

2002-10-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021021

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021018

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021017

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021002

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-03

2001-05-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-04-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200123

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000526

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970521

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT