Global Patent Index - EP 0779401 B1

EP 0779401 B1 2001-03-28 - Covering device for part of a pool, i.e. a swimming pool, such as stair or similar

Title (en)

Covering device for part of a pool, i.e. a swimming pool, such as stair or similar

Title (de)

Abdeckungsvorrichtung für einen Teil eines Beckens, der Art eines Schwimmbades, wie zum Beispiel eine Treppe oder ähnliches

Title (fr)

Dispositif de recouvrement de partie de bassin, du type piscine, tel que d'un escalier ou analogue

Publication

EP 0779401 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96440106 A

Priority

FR 9515003 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0779401A1] The extension is designed to cover a section adjacent to the main pool, e.g. steps. The extension consists of a supporting bar (12) which lies in line with the edge (4) of the swimming pool. It is provided with fastenings for an additional covering layer (14) which corresponds in shape to the adjacent pool section (10). The edge (15) of the additional covering layer (14) is equipped with tensioners (16) in the form of straps or elastic strips. The supporting bar is equipped with spikes or other fastenings to fix it relative to the pool edge (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 4/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES LI LU MC NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0779401 A1 19970618; EP 0779401 B1 20010328; AT 200131 T 20010415; DE 69612266 D1 20010503; DE 69612266 T2 20011018; FR 2742182 A1 19970613; FR 2742182 B1 19980130

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69612266

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69612266

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT DR. WEISS, ARA, DE

2015-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69612266

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT WEISS, ARAT & , DE

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-07-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WALTER S.A.S.

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090112

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-02-27 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WALTER S.A.S.

- Free text: WALTER#ZONE INDUSTRIELLE NORD - CD 58#67170 BRUMATH (FR) -TRANSFER TO- WALTER S.A.S.#CD 58 - RUE DE L'INDUSTRIE#67170 BRUMATH (FR)

2003-07-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-12-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021206

2002-12-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021206

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-03 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020103

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20011227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-21 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20011221

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-06-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612266 20010503

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES LI LU MC NL PT

2001-03-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200131 T 20010415

2000-02-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WALTER

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981105

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970630

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES LI LU MC NL PT