Global Patent Index - EP 0779411 B1

EP 0779411 B1 2001-05-23 - Valve driving device for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Valve driving device for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Ventiltrieb einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Commande de soupape pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0779411 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116552 A

Priority

  • DE 19546437 A
  • DE 19622174 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0779411A1] The valve drive has at least one valve for gas exchange, which is acted upon by a cam (3) with at least two cam paths (15-17) with different lifts. A first transmission element (13) works in combination with the first path and the shaft (10) of the valve. An adjacent second transmission element (14) works in combination with the second path. Both elements can be connected together in a first position of a moving coupling (38), and can operate independently of one another in its second position. The coupling has two locking grooves (41,42) which work together with a locking pin (43), so that the coupling is locked in its second position. The latter element releases the coupling depending on the cam path, so that it can be moved to its first position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 13/00; F01L 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/14 (2006.01); F01L 1/26 (2006.01); F01L 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/0036 (2013.01); F01L 1/267 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0779411 A1 19970618; EP 0779411 B1 20010523; JP H09184409 A 19970715

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606950

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101016

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101016

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101016

2011-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110331 AND 20110406

2011-04-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110310 AND 20110316

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100923

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091022

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-07-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606950 20010628

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-02-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991115

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971108

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT