Global Patent Index - EP 0779414 B1

EP 0779414 B1 2001-05-16 - Device for automatically topping-up a container with liquid

Title (en)

Device for automatically topping-up a container with liquid

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur automatischen Nachfüllung eines Flüssigkeitsbehälters

Title (fr)

Dispositif de remplissage automatique d'un réservoir avec un liquide

Publication

EP 0779414 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96119798 A

Priority

IT TO950993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0779414A1] A device (1) for automatically topping-up a container (2) with liquid, provided with a pneumatically actuated pump (4) and having an intake orifice (51) connected to a liquid collecting reservoir (5) and a delivery orifice (53) for the liquid itself, with a cylindrical sensor means (15, 33) disposed substantially in alignment with a desired level (L3) of the liquid in the container (2) and comprising a chamber (34) having at least one opening (30) communicating with the interior of the container (2) itself and a piston (33) adapted to slide in a sealed manner in the chamber (34) when the level of liquid in the container is below said desired level (L3), with a duct (40) provided in the body of piston (33) and adapted to be actuated pneumatically to displace the piston (33) itself between a closed position between the duct (40) and the opening (30) and an opening position of the connection itself, and with means (8 10) for actuating pneumatically and simultaneously the pump (4) and the actuator means (35). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 11/04; F01M 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/04 (2006.01); F01M 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/06 (2013.01); F01M 11/0458 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0779414 A1 19970618; EP 0779414 B1 20010516; DE 69612821 D1 20010621; DE 69612821 T2 20010920; ES 2157391 T3 20010816; IT 1281064 B1 19980211; IT TO950993 A1 19970612; IT TO950993 D0 19951212

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071116

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2007-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051212

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051210

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-12-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051210

2005-12-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051210

2005-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050126

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041211

2004-12-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041207

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031205

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157391 T3

2001-06-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612821 20010621

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IRISBUS ITALIA S.P.A.

1999-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IVECO BUS S.P.A.

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971104

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE