Global Patent Index - EP 0779428 B1

EP 0779428 B1 2000-06-14 - Method and apparatus for controlling the torque of an engine

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for controlling the torque of an engine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Motormomentregelung

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour contrôler le couple d'un moteur

Publication

EP 0779428 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117576 A

Priority

DE 19546554 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19546554C1] A procedure and a device for controlling the torque of an IC engine use the limiting of the fuel injection for rapid torque reduction according to a particular pattern. In parallel with this, the throttle flap is controlled, through which the load-indicated torque is adjusted to the delivered torque. The criterion for the particular pattern is the difference between load-indicated and delivered torque.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/0087 (2013.01); F02D 2250/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19546554 C1 19970227; EP 0779428 A2 19970618; EP 0779428 A3 19990107; EP 0779428 B1 20000614; US 5724942 A 19980310

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59605438

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-15 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2010-01-15 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2004-01-02 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20030926

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: AUDI AG

- Effective date: 20010314

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000710

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605438

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-20

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990720

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981208

1999-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT