Global Patent Index - EP 0779480 A3

EP 0779480 A3 2000-03-22 - Air outlet

Title (en)

Air outlet

Title (de)

Luftauslass

Title (fr)

Sortie d'air

Publication

EP 0779480 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96118733 A

Priority

DE 19546139 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19546139A1] The air outlet feeds cold or warm air into a room. It has an outlet socket (1), covered by a perforated plate. The plate has an associated air guide socket (3), which is located inside the outlet socket, and is connected to it centrally. The air guide socket has a cylindrical collar (18) with openings (20), and a funnel (19) connected to the collar. A cover ring (17) is placed on the perforated plate behind the funnel. The air guide socket has an internal profile (5), connected to the inside of the collar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/068

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/06 (2013.01); F24F 2221/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19546139 A1 19970612; DE 19546139 C2 19990325; AT 243307 T 20030715; EP 0779480 A2 19970618; EP 0779480 A3 20000322; EP 0779480 B1 20030618; ES 2194948 T3 20031201

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170301

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161121

2017-01-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 243307 T

- Effective date: 20161122

2016-12-14 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161121

2016-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-11-23 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20161121

2016-11-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59610540

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59610540

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT DR. WEISS, ARA, DE

2015-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59610540

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT WEISS, ARAT & , DE

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-02-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SCHAKO KLIMA LUFT FERDINAND SCHAD KG

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610540 P 20030724

2003-07-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SCHAKO KLIMA LUFT FERDINAND SCHAD KG

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020403

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL