Global patent index - EP 0779486 B1

EP 0779486 B1 2001-02-28 - Apparatus for heat treatment of running webs

Title (en)

Apparatus for heat treatment of running webs

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Wärmebehandeln von durchlaufenden Warenbahnen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le traitement par chaleur de bandes continues

Publication

EP 0779486 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96116220 A

Priority

DE 19546344 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0779486A1] The device comprises a built housing (1) as a sealed steam bell that consists of, at least, one chamber (9) equipped with a ventilator that is coupled, via a shaft (33), to a motor on the outer part of the housing. It has nozzle boxes with directed nozzle openings on the conveying track, and a heater sealed with leads (39) for guiding of gaseous or liquid substances. There are inlet and outlet slits adapted to the base (7) of the housing, as well as a system for conveying and guiding of the handling conveying track in a longitudinal direction through the housing. The shaft and the leads penetrate the base of the housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/02 (2006.01); F26B 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0779486 A1 19970618; EP 0779486 B1 20010228; DE 19546344 A1 19970619; US 5855476 A 19990105

INPADOC legal status

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081010

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081020

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051010

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071211

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071203

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061010

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061010

2006-11-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061101

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-21 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2005-10-21 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2005-10-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-10-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051011

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051010

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-07-16 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20030124

2002-07-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BTM TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BRUECKNER TROCKENTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-07-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BTM-TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-05-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606499

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-05

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990430

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971218

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT