Global Patent Index - EP 0779560 A3

EP 0779560 A3 2000-10-04 - Electrostatic latent image developing method and apparatus

Title (en)

Electrostatic latent image developing method and apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entwickeln eines elektrostatischen latenten Bildes

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de développement d'une imgae latente électrostatique

Publication

EP 0779560 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96119782 A

Priority

DE 19546248 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19546248A1] The method operates on the surface (4) of a cylinder (2) to which charged dielectric ink particles (6) are transferred. They are transferred through a gap (5) under the surface (3) of another cylinder (1). The gap is largely filled with loose particles moving under the influence of three successive voltage differences. The first voltage difference (U0) between the developing cylinder and blank areas of the image is substantially zero. The next (Umax) is sufficient to separate particles completely from the image carrier in these areas. The final difference has an intermediate value (UE).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 13/08; G03G 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/06 (2006.01); G03G 13/08 (2006.01); G03G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/0806 (2013.01); G03G 13/08 (2013.01); G03G 15/0818 (2013.01); Y10S 101/37 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19546248 A1 19970619; CN 1158437 A 19970903; EP 0779560 A2 19970618; EP 0779560 A3 20001004; EP 0779560 B1 20020814; JP H09179401 A 19970711; KR 100236262 B1 19991215; US 5737004 A 19980407

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2004-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

2004-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: HEIDELBERG DIGITAL L.L.C.

2004-12-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: NEXPRESS DIGITAL LLC

2004-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-10-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041025

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-12-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021125

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021028

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609560 20020919

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020207

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL

1997-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961210

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL