Global Patent Index - EP 0779768 B1

EP 0779768 B1 2000-05-10 - Circuit for operating a discharge lamp

Title (en)

Circuit for operating a discharge lamp

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zum Betrieb einer Entladungslampe

Title (fr)

Circuit pour alimenter une lampe à décharge

Publication

EP 0779768 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118851 A

Priority

DE 19546588 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0779768A2] The load circuit contains the lamp (EL) with a parallel capacitor (C5), a series choke (L2), a capacitor (C6) and a current-measuring resistance (R2). In the preheating phase the load current is measured, an invariant desired value worked out and a clock generator activated at a free-running frequency between the pole values for lamp ignition and extinction. The ignition phase begins with load current measurement and derivation of a variable set-point. The clock generator is synchronised to the invertor frequency. This phase ends with the set-point attaining a value at which the conduction time of a half-bridge exceeds the free-running clock period.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/295

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/24 (2006.01); H05B 41/295 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/295 (2013.01); Y10S 315/05 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0779768 A2 19970618; EP 0779768 A3 19971029; EP 0779768 B1 20000510; CA 2192506 A1 19970614; CA 2192506 C 20041116; CN 1155825 A 19970730; CN 1199525 C 20050427; DE 19546588 A1 19970619; JP H09219293 A 19970819; KR 100432541 B1 20040811; US 5828187 A 19981027

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59605182

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131125

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59605182

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59605182

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-01-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59605182

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111130

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051108

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061125

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061125

2007-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2005-11-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-09 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051109

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051108

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-07-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605182

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 05B 41/295 A

1998-03-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980120

1998-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971120

1997-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL