Global Patent Index - EP 0779944 B1

EP 0779944 B1 2000-03-08 - SHAPED BRICK AND SET OF SHAPED BRICKS

Title (en)

SHAPED BRICK AND SET OF SHAPED BRICKS

Title (de)

FORMSTEIN UND FORMSTEINSATZ

Title (fr)

BRIQUE MOULEE ET ENSEMBLE DE BRIQUES MOULEES

Publication

EP 0779944 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95932023 A

Priority

  • DE 4432196 A
  • EP 9503565 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4432196A1] The invention concerns a set of shaped bricks and is characterized in that it comprises first shaped bricks (2) having a shape which is waisted in plan view and divided into two triangles (4, 6) by a dummy joint (8). The set further comprises second shaped bricks (12) which are hexagonal in plan view. The invention further concerns a shaped brick (2) corresponding to the first shaped brick of this set of shaped bricks.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/00 (2013.01); E01C 2201/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 4432196 A1 19960314; AT 190373 T 20000315; AU 3523495 A 19960327; EP 0779944 A1 19970625; EP 0779944 B1 20000308; WO 9607793 A1 19960314

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2001-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010911

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001120

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-09-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20000922

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-09-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20000922

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000616

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-04-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KANN GMBH BAUSTOFFWERKE

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, VON REVY & PARTNER

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507970 20000413

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2000-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190373 T 20000315

1997-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970829

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970409

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI