Global patent index - EP 0779949 B1

EP 0779949 B1 2000-08-09 - FUEL INJECTION DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZEINRICHTUNG FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0779949 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96901744 A

Priority

  • DE 19504849 A
  • EP 9600230 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19504849A1] A fuel injection device for internal combustion engines with a high-pressure fuel pump (1) which conveys fuel from a low-pressure chamber (3) through a feed pipe (5) into a high-pressure collecting chamber (common rail) (7) which is connected via high-pressure pipes (9) to the individual injection valves (11) projecting into the combustion chamber of the engine to be fuelled. To permit variable injection cross-sections at the injection valves (11), the latter take the form of injection valves with an outwardly open valve member (17) via the controllable opening movement towards the combustion chamber of which it is possible to set a variable injection cross-section at the injection valve (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 61/08; F02M 61/16; F02M 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 45/12 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 47/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/04 (2006.01); F02M 61/08 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/182 (2013.01); F02M 45/12 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 47/06 (2013.01); F02M 61/042 (2013.01); F02M 61/045 (2013.01); F02M 61/08 (2013.01); F02M 61/161 (2013.01); F02M 61/205 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19504849 A1 19960822; CN 1062331 C 20010221; CN 1145652 A 19970319; EP 0779949 A1 19970625; EP 0779949 B1 20000809; JP H09512616 A 19971216; US 5823161 A 19981020; WO 9625596 A1 19960822

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-03-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040310

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-01-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030117

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030113

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605715

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-14

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981214

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970224

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT