Global Patent Index - EP 0780061 B1

EP 0780061 B1 2001-05-09 - Special suit

Title (en)

Special suit

Title (de)

Spezialanzug

Title (fr)

Combinaison spéciale

Publication

EP 0780061 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96119711 A

Priority

DE 19547795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0780061A1] The protective clothing has an outer layer (110) for protection against external effects, and an inner layer (120) which is permeable to moisture and/or vapour. An intermediate layer (130), to keep the outer (110) and inner (120) layers apart, has a fluid temp. control, such as with air and/or helium. The intermediate layer (130) has an elastic structure through a pressure-resistant and flexible knitted and/or woven fabric, held together by a linking synthetic yarn. The protective clothing fabric is worked in selected zones for protection of the abdomen and/or legs and/or arms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/002 (2006.01); A41D 13/005 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/002 (2013.01); A41D 13/005 (2013.01); Y10S 2/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0780061 A1 19970625; EP 0780061 B1 20010509; CA 2193177 A1 19970621; CA 2193177 C 20020219; DE 19547795 A1 19970626; DE 19547795 C2 19980820; ES 2157390 T3 20010816; TR 199601020 A2 19970721; TR 199601020 A3 19970721; US 5774902 A 19980707

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141210

2016-01-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160126

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141209

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141209

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141209

2015-08-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141210

2015-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-07-29 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606873

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20131216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-10-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-10-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2006-08-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: AUTOFLUG GMBH

- Effective date: 20060607

2006-05-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-04-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: AUTOFLUG GMBH

- Free text: SD & E SYSTEM DESIGN & ENGINEERING GMBH#RIEDHEIMER STR.10#88677 MARKDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- AUTOFLUG GMBH#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 10#25462 RELLINGEN (DE)

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010727

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157390 T3

2001-06-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606873 20010613

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL & PARTNER AG PATENTBUERO

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-03-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SD & E SYSTEM DESIGN & ENGINEERING GMBH

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990806

1997-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971015

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE