Global Patent Index - EP 0780065 B1

EP 0780065 B1 2001-04-04 - Assembling device for the upper and the sole of a shoe

Title (en)

Assembling device for the upper and the sole of a shoe

Title (de)

Montiermaschine für Oberteil und Sohle eines Schuhes

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'assemblage de la tige et de la semelle d'une chaussure

Publication

EP 0780065 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96420359 A

Priority

FR 9515207 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0780065A1] The unit consists of a conveyor (2) for delivering plates (3) carrying lasts (4) with uppers or soles (5), and a bench (7) with a series of tracks (8) perpendicular to the conveyor, equipped with transfer mechanisms for moving the plates between the conveyor and a point at some distance from it. The unit also has a robot (12) situated to one side of the bench opposite the conveyor, a press (13) to one side of the robot, and a manual assembly post for uppers and soles at the other side. During operation the robot picks up a last with an upper, turns it and transfers it towards a sole which has its edges held open by grippers so that the upper can be inserted and fixed with adhesive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43D 119/00; A43D 111/00; A43D 117/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43D 111/00 (2006.01); A43D 117/00 (2006.01); A43D 119/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43D 111/00 (2013.01); A43D 117/00 (2013.01); A43D 119/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB GR IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0780065 A1 19970625; EP 0780065 B1 20010404; AT 200193 T 20010415; DE 69612360 D1 20010510; FR 2742313 A1 19970620; FR 2742313 B1 19980313; US 5768732 A 19980623

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-10-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-07-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-07-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-07-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-07-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612360 20010510

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB GR IT PT SE

2001-04-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200193 T 20010415

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991025

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971219

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB GR IT PT SE