Global Patent Index - EP 0780071 A3

EP 0780071 A3 2000-12-20 - Drawer with ball drawer slide

Title (en)

Drawer with ball drawer slide

Title (de)

Schublade mit Rollen-Ausziehführung

Title (fr)

Tiroir muni de glissière à billes

Publication

EP 0780071 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96115103 A

Priority

DE 19547685 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0780071A2] The running roller (20) is rotatable around an horizontally running axis at right-angles to the withdrawal direction. It can run on running tracks (18a,18b) on a running rail (14) on the furniture body wall. The guide rails (14) in their body outer front end area have at least one running roller (24) rolling on a running track (26) formed on the drawer side wall (12). The running roller rotatably located on the drawer side wall (12) in the furniture body interior end area has a slider component part (38) held longitudinally displaceably on the side wall between an inwardly drawn position and a withdrawn position over the rear wall of the drawer in the direction of the furniture rear wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/487 (2017.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0780071 A2 19970625; EP 0780071 A3 20001220; EP 0780071 B1 20021113; AT 227532 T 20021115; DE 19547685 A1 19970626; DE 19547685 B4 20040205; ES 2181833 T3 20030301; US 5733027 A 19980331

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080922

2009-11-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080922

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080920

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080920

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070907

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-09-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021113

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181833 T3

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT ES GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227532 T 20021115

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020221

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT ES GB IT

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT ES GB IT