Global Patent Index - EP 0780083 B1

EP 0780083 B1 2002-11-27 - Electric apparatus for steam cleaning of smooth surfaces such as window-panes

Title (en)

Electric apparatus for steam cleaning of smooth surfaces such as window-panes

Title (de)

Elektrisches Gerät zum Dampfreinigen von glatten Oberflächen wie Fensterscheiben

Title (fr)

Appareil électrique de nettoyage à la vapeur d'eau de surfaces lisses telles que des vitres

Publication

EP 0780083 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402850 A

Priority

FR 9515345 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0780083A1] The cleaner has a plastic casing (10) around an instant steam generator (21) working at atmospheric pressure with a capillary porous water-storage body (34) and electric heating resistors (30). The steam is distributed through a range of frontal apertures (17). The casing has a forward projection (14) into which a scraper (15) is fitted to protrude in front of the appliance. To reduce thermal inertia the capillary body is compressed around the heating elements by two half-envelopes pierced to allow ingress of water and escape of steam.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 1/05 (2006.01); A47L 1/08 (2006.01); A47L 11/34 (2006.01); A47L 11/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0780083 A1 19970625; EP 0780083 B1 20021127; AT 228326 T 20021215; CA 2193291 A1 19970623; DE 69625028 D1 20030109; DE 69625028 T2 20031023; ES 2192220 T3 20031001; FR 2742682 A1 19970627; FR 2742682 B1 19980313; JP H09182693 A 19970715; US 6112367 A 20000905

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071220

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071220

2007-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051221

2006-12-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-12-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061211

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-12-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-12-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051220

2004-12-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192220 T3

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DOMENA

- Effective date: 20021231

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030329

2003-02-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-02-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69625028 20030109

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228326 T 20021215

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DOMENA

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971127

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB GR IT LI NL PT SE