Global Patent Index - EP 0780143 B1

EP 0780143 B1 2001-03-28 - Snowboard with stiffening device

Title (en)

Snowboard with stiffening device

Title (de)

Gleitbrett mit Versteifungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Planche de glisse équipée d'un dispositif raidisseur

Publication

EP 0780143 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96420344 A

Priority

FR 9515457 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0780143A1] The ski or snow-board (1) has a lower sliding surface and an upper surface with boot fastening clamps (3,4) and a regulator for varying the rigidity of the ski/snow-board. The regulator comprises an upper elongated platform (2) carrying the clamps, fixed or hinged to the board by its forward end, having an intermediate support (12) which is either fixed or sliding, an elastic block, and a pair of cams (14) at the rear end. The cams are located on the underside of the platform and the upper surface of the board and have interacting sloping surfaces (15,17) which form an angle of 30 - 60 degrees, and preferably 45 degrees, with the board's upper surface. In a variant of the design one of the cams can be a cylindrical roller, turning about an axis perpendicular to the board's median lengthwise plane, and the cams can be surfaced with a friction reducing material, such as PTFE.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/07 (2006.01); A63C 9/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/003 (2013.01); A63C 5/07 (2013.01); A63C 9/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0780143 A1 19970625; EP 0780143 B1 20010328; AT 200033 T 20010415; DE 69612268 D1 20010503; DE 69612268 T2 20020103; FR 2742344 A1 19970620; FR 2742344 B1 19980116; US 5927743 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071108

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061129

2006-11-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061108

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69612268

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-03

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19961204

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200033

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001128

1997-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970628

1997-07-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

1997-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 961204