Global Patent Index - EP 0780195 B1

EP 0780195 B1 2000-05-03 - Powder driven fastener tool with a non-return valve for returning the driver piston

Title (en)

Powder driven fastener tool with a non-return valve for returning the driver piston

Title (de)

Pulverkraftbetriebenes Setzgerät mit Rückschlagventil zum Zurückführen des Treibkolbens

Title (fr)

Outil de scellement actionné par poudre avec une soupape de non retour pour retourner le piston d'entraînement

Publication

EP 0780195 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810713 A

Priority

DE 19547859 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0780195A1] The driving piston (9) works in a guide (13) with bore in a section (7) of the housing, being thrust forward by the propellant gases. A passage (18b) between the housing-section mounting (33) and the guide is connected by a port (17) to the guide bore. A further port (14) connected to atmosphere is contained in the mounting, and a valve in the passage forms an accumulator chamber shut off from atmosphere. At the cartridge end, the guide has a passage (20) connected to the port and which is shut off by the piston. The valve (5) is of the non-return type. It can be opened against spring action (26) by the gases flowing from the cartridge mounting (10), and can be situated in the part of the mounting enclosing the piston guide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25C 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/10 (2006.01); B25C 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0780195 A1 19970625; EP 0780195 B1 20000503; AU 704410 B2 19990422; AU 7544796 A 19970626; CN 1061584 C 20010207; CN 1159379 A 19970917; DE 19547859 A1 19970626; JP H09183080 A 19970715; KR 100404357 B1 20040309; TW 324678 B 19980111; US 5767434 A 19980616

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605124

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141023

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141008

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061025

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061025

2005-10-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-10-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021026

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011005

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605124 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991007

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971229

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE