Global Patent Index - EP 0780200 B1

EP 0780200 B1 2001-02-28 - Cutting device on a plane for flexible materials like leather or fabric

Title (en)

Cutting device on a plane for flexible materials like leather or fabric

Title (de)

Schneidvorrichtung für flächige, biegeschlaffe Gebilde, wie z.b. für Lederhäute oder Textilbahnen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la coupe de matériaux plans et souples tels que la peau ou l'étoffe

Publication

EP 0780200 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96120687 A

Priority

DE 19548304 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0780200A1] The cutting device has a cutting tool (36) supported by a holder guided along a contour cutting line. The holder is provided by a remote-controlled wheeled carriage (15) displaced within the cutting plane. Its driven wheels are in direct contact with the leather skin or textile web being cut. The carriage movement is controlled in an X-Y coordinate system, with a rotation axis (29) used for providing tangential control of the cut. The cutting contour is via a laser guidance beam (L) and a cooperating CCD camera.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26F 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/38 (2006.01); C14B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14B 5/00 (2013.01); B26F 1/3813 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0780200 A1 19970625; EP 0780200 B1 20010228; DE 19548304 A1 19970626; DE 19548304 C2 19970925

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-20 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606500

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111220

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111220

2012-07-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BRUDER WOLFGANG

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-01-05 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59606500

- Effective date: 20111022

2011-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110105

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110118

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101209

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20101228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-09-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-12-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031222

2002-12-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20021230

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606500 20010405

2001-04-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010309

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE NL

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRUDER, WOLFGANG, DIPL.-ING.

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KUEPPER, GERD, ING. (GRAD.)

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BIERVERT, KLAUS

2000-10-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE NL

2000-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000725

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971223

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE NL