Global Patent Index - EP 0780312 B1

EP 0780312 B1 2000-03-22 - Package made from cardboard

Title (en)

Package made from cardboard

Title (de)

Karton-Verpackung

Title (fr)

Emballage en carton

Publication

EP 0780312 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96118284 A

Priority

DE 19543609 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0780312A1] The box comprises a main body (1) of cardboard having a gastight coating on the inside, and top and bottom sections (2) each consisting of a main part (6) with flaps (7) at the edges protruding inside the main body. These sections are also of cardboard with a gastight coating on the inside, their flaps being joined to each other by gusset portions (9). The flaps are joined to the main body on the inside, and one of the sides (5) of the body consists entirely of two overlapping layers. The gusset portions can occupy a space smaller than that enclosed by the corner joint lines of the adjacent flaps, and can each consist of two triangular pieces joined together, and to the flaps at their outer edges.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/14 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 8003179 U1 19800612 - MARKHORST MASCHF BV [NL]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0780312 A1 19970625; EP 0780312 B1 20000322

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KRUGMANN ALFRED R.

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KRUGMANN GERARD M.

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061114

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061114

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-01-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000622

2000-06-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000622

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604760 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB NL SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

1998-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980812

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970530

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB NL SE